Burnside et al v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Carol Burnside and Stephen Burnside
Defendant: Allergan PLC, Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., McGhan Medical Corporation and Inamed Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01054
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 7/1/2019. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Carol Burnside, Stephen Burnside (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCormick, Brian)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Allergan's Second Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Jury Demand. Defendants shall file responsive pleadings no later than 8/5/2019. The Scheduling Conference remains set on 7/9/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/20/2019. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Jury Demand [Unopposed] by Defendants Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ingebretsen, Stephen)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, re: #5 and #16 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/3/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc. All parties consent.. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/9/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 7/2/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/28/2019. (ksena)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for A 30-day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Jury Demand. Defendants shall file responsive pleadings no later than 6/21/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/2019. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ingebretsen, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC for Allergan Inc.. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allergan Inc. for Allergan USA, Inc.. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lori Connors McGroder on behalf of Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc.Attorney Lori Connors McGroder added to party Allergan Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lori Connors McGroder added to party Allergan USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (McGroder, Lori)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen on behalf of Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc.Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Allergan Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Allergan USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Burnside, Stephen Burnside. Allergan USA, Inc. served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (McCormick, Brian)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Burnside, Stephen Burnside. Allergan Inc. served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (McCormick, Brian)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/4/2019 11:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/28/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/12/2019. (ksena)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01054-KMT. (athom, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., INAMED Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6628028)Attorney Jason William Jordan added to party Carol Burnside(pty:pla), Attorney Jason William Jordan added to party Stephen Burnside(pty:pla), filed by Carol Burnside, Stephen Burnside. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jordan, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnside et al v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Lori Connors McGroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Lori Connors McGroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGhan Medical Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Lori Connors McGroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inamed Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Lori Connors McGroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Burnside
Represented By: Brian J. McCormick, Jr.
Represented By: Jason William Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Burnside
Represented By: Brian J. McCormick, Jr.
Represented By: Jason William Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?