Morehead v. Rappa et al

Plaintiff: Dr James Morehead and James Morehead
Defendant: Norma S Rappa, Spatique One, LLC, JVNS LLC, Norma Sherry Spatique, LLC and Norma Sherry Spatique LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01071
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER Re: Status Report [ECF. #12 ]. The parties have indicated that they have reached an agreement to settle all claims in this matter. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file their Dismissal Papers by 7/5/2019. If the parties are unable to finalize the settlement by this date, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that they shall file a Status Report requesting an extension of time or that the Court reset the Scheduling Conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/21/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 First STATUS REPORT Morehead v. Rappa et al by Plaintiff James Morehead. (Simpson, Mason)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Status Report due by 6/21/2019 pursuant to 10 Order. (nmarb, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Vacating Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Defendants appear to have been served in late April 2019. As of the date of this order, no Defendant has filed a response to the Complaint or made an appearance in this matter. Absent active defendants, the Court finds it necessary to vacate the Scheduling Conference. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a Status Report on 6/21/2019 suggesting how it would like the Court to proceed with this matter. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/14/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 6/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/13/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #8 ) is due 6/13/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/2/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01071-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Morehead. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service JVNS, #2 Affidavit Proof of Service Norma S. Rappa, #3 Affidavit Proof of Service Norma Sherry Spatique LLC, #4 Affidavit Proof of Service Spatique One LLC)(Simpson, Mason)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Mason C. Simpson.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6630798)Attorney Mason Chandler Simpson added to party James Morehead(pty:pla), filed by James Morehead.(Simpson, Mason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morehead v. Rappa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma S Rappa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spatique One, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JVNS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Sherry Spatique, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Sherry Spatique LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr James Morehead
Represented By: Mason Chandler Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Morehead
Represented By: Mason Chandler Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?