Hamric v. Comcast Cable Communications LLC

Plaintiff: Zachary Hamric
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC and Comcast Cable Communications LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01086
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/19. Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge John L. Kane on 6/10/2019. (cthom, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 Upon the passing of Judge Richard P. Matsch and pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), this case has been reassigned to Judge John L. Kane effective this date. All future pleading should be designated as 19-cv-01086-JLK. (Text Only Entry) (ktera)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Comcast Cable Communications LLC All parties consent.. (Mackender, Darin)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Plaintiff Zachary Hamric. (LeRoux, Paul)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26 (f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telephone chambers [303-844-4627] within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/22/2019. (ktera)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Comcast Cable Communications LLC. (Mackender, Darin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications LLC.(Mackender, Darin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Charles Roth on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications LLCAttorney David Charles Roth added to party Comcast Cable Communications LLC(pty:dft) (Roth, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Darin L. Mackender on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications LLC (Mackender, Darin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Comcast Cable Communications LLC, filed by Zachary Hamric.(rroge, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC from District Court, Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2019cv30196. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6632516), filed by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Mackender, Darin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamric v. Comcast Cable Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Hamric
Represented By: Paul LeRoux, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Represented By: Darin L. Mackender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications LLC
Represented By: Darin L. Mackender
Represented By: David Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?