White v. Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC et al

Plaintiff: David White
Defendant: Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC and Jimmy Lee Twiss
Case Number: 1:2019cv01094
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC, and Jimmy Lee Twiss by Plaintiff David White. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David White)(Swan, Andrew)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC, and Jimmy Lee Twiss filed by David White. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 6/27/2019. (cthom, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC, and Jimmy Lee Twiss by Plaintiff David White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits of Service on Defendants, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Andrew E. Swan)(Swan, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC, Jimmy Lee Twiss re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default, by Clerk. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC, and Jimmy Lee Twiss by Plaintiff David White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits of Service)(Swan, Andrew) Modified to correct title on 6/25/2019 (cthom, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David White. Jimmy Lee Twiss served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Swan, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David White. Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Swan, Andrew)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Forrest Lewis on behalf of David WhiteAttorney Paul Forrest Lewis added to party David White(pty:pla) (Lewis, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Dickson Kuhn on behalf of David WhiteAttorney Michael Dickson Kuhn added to party David White(pty:pla) (Kuhn, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC, Jimmy Lee Twiss (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6633755)Attorney Andrew Edward Swan added to party David White(pty:pla), filed by David White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1_Consent to Become Party Plaintiff_David White, #3 Summons Proposed Summons_Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC, #4 Summons Proposed Summons_Jimmy Lee Twiss)(Swan, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Shot Roofing and Gutters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Lee Twiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David White
Represented By: Andrew Edward Swan
Represented By: Michael Dickson Kuhn
Represented By: Paul Forrest Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?