Faucher v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Kevin Faucher
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv01107
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN ORDER: SS Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 7/24/2019. SS Defendant's Response Brief due by 8/14/2019. SS Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 8/28/2019. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/25/2019. (wydlc2, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Kevin Faucher All parties do not consent.. (Seckar, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Joint Case Management Plan by Plaintiff Kevin Faucher. (Seckar, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document, #8 Continuation of Main Document, #9 Continuation of Main Document, #10 Continuation of Main Document)(Schabacker, Noah)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Noah Michael Schabacker on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Noah Michael Schabacker added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Schabacker, Noah)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(e) and General Order 2019-2, this case has been reassigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger effective this date. All future pleadings should be designated 18-cv-01107-MSK. Text only entry. (angar, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 Upon the passing of Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(e), this case has been reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn effective this date. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01107-REB. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN for Social Security Cases, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (evana, )
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/16/2019. (evana, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 6/14/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 4/16/2019 (cmadr, ).
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Kevin Faucher. (Seckar, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL Attorney Michael W. Seckar added to party Kevin Faucher(pty:pla), filed by Kevin Faucher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seckar, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faucher v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Faucher
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Noah Michael Schabacker
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?