Stribling v. Florence FCI Prison Administration

Petitioner: Allen Mendez Stribling
Respondent: Florence FCI Prison Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01109
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiency. If Petitioner fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/16/2019. (angar, ) forms mailed as ordered
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from the Northern District of Texas; Case Number 5:18-cv-00278. File, transfer order and docket sheet received .
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Mon Apr 15 11:41:41 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/15/2019) (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED PETITION against Florence FCI Prison Administration filed by Allen Mendez Stribling. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Allen Mendez Stribling. New address: Federal Transfer Center P.O. Box 898801 Oklahoma City, OK 73189-8801. (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. See Order #10 for image. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/21/2019) (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. The Clerk mailed Petitioner a 2241 form marked "Amended Petition," Civil Action Number 5:18-CV-278-C along with a copy of this Order #10 .. Thu Feb 21 10:42:04 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court has twice ordered Petitioner to file an Amended Petition using the proper form. (See Docs. #4 and #5 ). Petitioner has not filed his Amended Petition. He must therefore file an Amended Petition on the form provided by the Clerk within 14 days from the date of this Order or show cause why his Petitionshould not be dismissed for want of prosecution. The Clerk mailed Petitioner a 2241 form marked "Amended Petition," Civil Action Number 5:18-CV-278-C. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/21/2019) (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address (temporary) for Pro Se litigant Allen Mendez Stribling. New address: FCI Englewood (FBOP) 9595 West Quency Avenue Littleton, CO 80123. (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with Certificate of Trust filed by Allen Mendez Stribling. (krd) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (bmg). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
January 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Jan 31 10:18:10 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court finds that Petitioner's #6 motion should be GRANTED. Petitioner shall file the required documents on or before February 21, 2019.The failure of Petitioner to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of his petition without further notice. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2019.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/31/2019) (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #5 Order And Notice of Deficiency, filed by Allen Mendez Stribling. (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
January 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Jan 15 10:45:49 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY SHOW CAUSE ORDER: It is, therefore, ORDERED that Petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to: [X] pay the filing fee of $5.00, OR IF UNABLE TO PAY, [X] file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, [X] file a certificate of his inmate trust account, AND [X] file an amended petition using the form previously provided by the Clerk; [X] show cause why his petition should not be dismissed for want of prosecution pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) because of his failure to respond to the Court's Order.The failure of Petitioner to respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal of his petition without further notice. Deadline to cure the deficiency is fourteen (14) days. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/15/2019) (krd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
December 10, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. IFP and Amended 2241 from mailed Mon Dec 10 11:09:22 CST 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER: Allen Mendez Stribling must address the following deficiency: Pay $5.00 Filing Fee or file application to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner will also need to file an amended petition using form provided by the clerk. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal without further notice. Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/10/2018) (egp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
December 4, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,3. Tue Dec 4 15:51:40 CST 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (bmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Mendez Stribling. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stribling v. Florence FCI Prison Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Mendez Stribling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florence FCI Prison Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?