Markley v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Darren Markley
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and U.S. Bank National Association doing business as US Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv01130
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331ag
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/24/2019. (bwilk, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 6/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/14/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF, and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/24/2019. (bwilk, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/20/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(Gomez, Michelle)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Darren Markley. (Benson, Gary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Michelle Lynn Gomez on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Gomez, Michelle)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bank National Association for U.S. Bank National Association. (Gomez, Michelle)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Bank National Association.(Gomez, Michelle)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Reset. Scheduling Conference RESET for 6/24/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 6/17/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5.29.2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling and Planning Conference filed by Darren Markley. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/29/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/24/2019. Text Only Entry (cpear)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/24/2019. Text Only Entry (cpear)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01130-RM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Darren Markley All parties do not consent.. (Benson, Gary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling and Planning Conference by Plaintiff Darren Markley. (Benson, Gary)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 5/29/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/12/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/6/2019. (agarc, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle Lynn Gomez on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michelle Lynn Gomez added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft) (Gomez, Michelle)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01130-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Darren Markley. U.S. Bank National Association waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Benson, Gary)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Gary J. Benson. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against U.S. Bank National Association d/b/a US Bank (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6640071)Attorney Sean Joseph O'Brien added to party DARREN MARKLEY(pty:pla), filed by DARREN MARKLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markley v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Markley
Represented By: Gary J. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association doing business as US Bank
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?