USA v. Real Property Located at 2885 C 1/2 Road, Grand Junction, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Real Property Located at 2530 South 21 1/2 Road, Glade Park, Colorado, Real Property Located at 759 33 Road, Clifton, Colorado, Real Property Located at 14371 B South Road, Glade Park, Colorado and Real Property Located at 2885 C 1/2 Road, Grand Junction, Colorado
Claimant: George Albino Gonzales and Anthony Respeto
Case Number: 1:2019cv01133
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings (Doc. #24 ), filed by claimant Anthony Respeto pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 981(g)(2) is GRANTED. The stay applies to all matters as to claimant Respeto and to his claimed interest in Defendant properties, including the filing of any answer or discovery. Claimant Respeto is ORDERED to file a status report within 20 days of the resolution of his pending criminal case. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/25/2019. (athom, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Claimant Anthony Respeto. (Moya, Frank)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frank E. Moya on behalf of Anthony RespetoAttorney Frank E. Moya added to party Anthony Respeto(pty:clm) (Moya, Frank)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #12 Second Claim Addressed to Anthony Respeto. (athom, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE Third Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The Unopposed Motion of Claimant to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 981(g)(2) (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. The stay applies to all matters as to claimant Gonzales and to his claimed interest in Defendant properties, including the filing of any answer or discovery. Claimant Gonzales is ORDERED to file a status report within 20 days of the resolution of his pending criminal case. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/05/2019. (athom, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE Second Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding Revised and Corrected by Claimant George Albino Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Complaint and Information, #2 Exhibit 2, Mesa County Assessor Screenshot, #3 Exhibit 3, Mesa County Assessor Screenshot, #4 Exhibit 4, Deed of Trust for 2530 S. 21 1/2 Road)(Petrey, Ashley)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Revised and Corrected by Ashley Marie Petrey on behalf of George Albino Gonzales (Petrey, Ashley)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #15 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #14 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding filed by attorney Ashley Marie Petrey. Attorney has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate the correct form for an attorneys signature block. These documents do not have a s/ signature and must be re-filed. When re-fling, please select the correct party you represent. You are entering an appearance for the claimant NOT the Defendant (Real Property). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Marie Petrey on behalf of George Albino Gonzales (Petrey, Ashley) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct filer and applicable party text (athom, ).
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding by Claimant George Albino Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, State Complaint and Information, #2 Exhibit 2, Screenshot of Mesa County Assessor's Website, #3 Exhibit 3, Screenshot of Mesa County Assessor's Website, #4 Exhibit 4, Deed of Trust for 2530 S. 21 1/2 Road)(Petrey, Ashley) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct filer (athom, ). Modified on 5/30/2019 to note that this motion has been re-filed as doc #18 (athom, ).
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service by MAIL by Clerk of Court re #12 Claim to Anthony Respeto, 759 33 Road, Clifton, CO 81520. Text Only Entry (evana, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Second CLAIM by Claimant Anthony Respeto. (evana, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 CLAIM by Claimant Anthony Respeto. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(athom, )
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico upon his appointment and the passing of Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01133-DDD. Text only entry. (agarc, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Signature Page by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Young, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 759 33 Road, Clifton, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 2530 South 21 1/2 Road, Glade Park, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 14371 B South Road, Glade Park, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 2885 C 1/2 Road, Grand Junction, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Real Property Located at 14371 B South Road, Glade Park, Colorado, Real Property Located at 2530 South 21 1/2 Road, Glade Park, Colorado, Real Property Located at 2885 C 1/2 Road, Grand Junction, Colorado, Real Property Located at 759 33 Road, Clifton, Colorado Attorney Elizabeth Jane Young added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Real Property Located at 2885 C 1/2 Road, Grand Junction, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 2530 South 21 1/2 Road, Glade Park, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 759 33 Road, Clifton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 14371 B South Road, Glade Park, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 2885 C 1/2 Road, Grand Junction, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George Albino Gonzales
Represented By: Ashley Marie Petrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony Respeto
Represented By: Frank E. Moya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?