Western State Bank, The v. Cosey, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Western State Bank, The
Defendant: Cheryl Ann Wollert, Cosey, L.L.C. and Kent Ray Wollert
Case Number: 1:2019cv01155
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss THE THIRD, FOURTH, AND FIFTH CLAIMS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREON filed by Plaintiff Western State Bank, The. (Laird, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY of Defendant Kent R. Wollert by Defendant Cheryl Ann Wollert. (Neiman, Kevin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss THE THIRD, FOURTH, AND FIFTH CLAIMS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREON by Defendant Cheryl Ann Wollert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Neiman, Kevin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Scott Neiman on behalf of Cheryl Ann WollertAttorney Kevin Scott Neiman added to party Cheryl Ann Wollert(pty:dft) (Neiman, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Cosey, L.L.C., Cheryl Ann Wollert, Kent Ray Wollert. Cosey, L.L.C. answer due 6/10/2019; Cheryl Ann Wollert answer due 6/10/2019; Kent Ray Wollert answer due 6/10/2019. (Laird, David)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Cosey, L.L.C. by Plaintiff Western State Bank, The. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - Kent Ray Wollert, #2 Affidavit of Service - Cheryl Ann Wollert)(Laird, David)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joyce Carmel Williams on behalf of The Western State BankAttorney Joyce Carmel Williams added to party The Western State Bank(pty:pla) (Williams, Joyce)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6643889)Attorney David A. Laird added to party The Western State Bank(pty:pla), filed by The Western State Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Cosey, L.L.C. d/b/a Wollert Automotive, #7 Summons Kent Ray Wollert, #8 Summons Cheryl Ann Wollert)(Laird, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western State Bank, The v. Cosey, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Ann Wollert
Represented By: Kevin Scott Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosey, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Ray Wollert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western State Bank, The
Represented By: David A. Laird
Represented By: Joyce Carmel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?