USA v. Radi et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Nancy Radi, Nancy Hendricks, Park County, CO, Nancy Colquitt, Denver County, CO, Darloc Enterprises, LLC, Darloc Ventures, Robert Colquitt, Christopher Tracy and Amanda Tracy
Case Number: 1:2019cv01161
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Because the Motion states the IRS approval process can be up to 75 days, Amanda Tracy's answer is due 9/16/2019; Christopher Tracy's answer is due 9/16/2019. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 7/2/2019. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Motion to Place Case in Suspence or to Extend the Time to Respond to Complaint filed by attorney Robert Pitler. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Motion to Place Case in Suspence or to Extend the Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Amanda Tracy, Christopher Tracy. (Pitler, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Two Week Extension to Respond to Complaint. Amanda Tracy answer due 7/2/2019; Christopher Tracy answer due 7/2/2019. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 6/17/2019. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Motion for Two Week Extension to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Amanda Tracy, Christopher Tracy. (Pitler, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by Denver County, CO.(Gorman, Edward)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edward James Gorman on behalf of Denver County, COAttorney Edward James Gorman added to party Denver County, CO(pty:dft) (Gorman, Edward)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (cthom, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Colquitt, Darloc Enterprises, LLC, Darloc Ventures, Denver County, CO, Park County, CO, Nancy Radi, Christopher Tracy, Amanda Tracy, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Redline Amended Complaint, #2 Summons - Christopher Tracy, #3 Summons - Amanda Tracy)(Watson, Ryan)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Colquitt, Darloc Enterprises, LLC, Darloc Ventures, Denver County, CO, Park County, CO, Nancy Radi a/k/a Nancy Colquitt a/k/a Nancy Hendricks Attorney Ryan S. Watson added to party The United States of America(pty:pla), filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Nancy Radi), #3 Summons (Robert Colquitt), #4 Summons (Darloc Enterprises, LLC), #5 Summons (Darloc Ventures), #6 Summons (Denver County), #7 Summons (Park County))(Watson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Radi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Radi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park County, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Colquitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver County, CO
Represented By: Edward James Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darloc Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darloc Ventures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Colquitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Tracy
Represented By: Robert L. Pitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Tracy
Represented By: Robert L. Pitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Ryan S. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?