Contreras v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Diane Contreras
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv01180
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Attorney Fees under the EAJA by Plaintiff Diane Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Atkinson, Ann)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Costs Taxed by Clerk in the amount of $400.00 against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and in favor of Plaintiff Diane Contreras. Costs awarded pursuant to the parties' Stipulation. (ebutl)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Bill of Costs (Stipulated) by Plaintiff Diane Contreras. (Atkinson, Ann)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Diane Contreras and against Commissioner, Social Security Administration pursuant to #11 Order for Judgment and Remand. Entered by Clerk on 6/24/2019. (lrobe)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Judgment and Remand granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/2019.(lrobe)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Blower, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document, #8 Continuation of Main Document, #9 Continuation of Main Document, #10 Continuation of Main Document, #11 Continuation of Main Document, #12 Continuation of Main Document, #13 Continuation of Main Document, #14 Continuation of Main Document, #15 Continuation of Main Document, #16 Continuation of Main Document, #17 Continuation of Main Document, #18 Continuation of Main Document, #19 Continuation of Main Document, #20 Continuation of Main Document, #21 Continuation of Main Document, #22 Continuation of Main Document, #23 Continuation of Main Document, #24 Continuation of Main Document, #25 Continuation of Main Document)(Blower, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David I. Blower on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney David I. Blower added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Blower, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (athom, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 6/22/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court; U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Review against NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6648033)Attorney Ann J. Atkinson added to party Diane Contreras(pty:pla), filed by Diane Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkinson, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: David I. Blower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Contreras
Represented By: Ann J. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?