USA v. Gervell
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Melissa Mary Gervell and Mary Melissa Gervell
Case Number: 1:2019cv01196
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Based on the #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Melissa Mary Gervell, the Scheduling Conference set for June 24, 2019, is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Melissa Mary Gervell by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C Dean, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gillespie, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Melissa Mary Gervell re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Melissa Mary Gervell, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (cthom, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Melissa Mary Gervell by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit C Dean, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Proposed Document Entry of Default)(Gillespie, William)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Melissa Mary Gervell served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Gillespie, William)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/24/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/26/2019. (ksena)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/24/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/2/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melissa Mary Gervell Attorney William Bennett Gillespie added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1: Certificate of Indebtedness, #4 Exhibit 2: Certificate of Indebtedness)(Gillespie, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Gervell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Mary Gervell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Melissa Gervell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: William Bennett Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?