Nickerson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Hilarie Nickerson
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv01219
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration All parties consent.. (Pedderson, Danielle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Joint Case Management Plan by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Pedderson, Danielle)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Pedderson, Danielle)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Danielle Alicia Pedderson on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Danielle Alicia Pedderson added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Pedderson, Danielle)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Case Management Plan) (sphil, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 Utility Setting Answer Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 6/24/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Review of Social Security Decision against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, filed by Hilarie Nickerson.(cmadr, )(Filing fee: $400.00, Receipt number: COX0900006) Modified to add receipt information on 4/25/2019 (cmadr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nickerson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilarie Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?