Wilson v. Pauling et al

Plaintiff: Amanda Wilson
Defendant: Two Mile Ranch, Elyce York, Mark Pauling, Jonathan Pauling, Lardyn Consulting LLC, Farmers State Bank and Two Mile Ranch General Partnership
Case Number: 1:2019cv01224
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER re: #5 Order to Set Scheduling Conference and 11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. The Court vacates the order of reference at ECF No. 11 and directs the parties to set a scheduling conference consistent with the order at ECF No. 5. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/27/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Wilson. Farmers State Bank served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Pulkrabek, Ross)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Wilson. Two Mile Ranch served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Pulkrabek, Ross)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Wilson. Jonathan Pauling served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Pulkrabek, Ross)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend. The Clerk of Court is directed to accept ECF No. 15-1 for filing. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/17/19. Text Only Entry(jdyne, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #12 by Plaintiff Amanda Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Pulkrabek, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Amanda Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pulkrabek, Ross)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and the direction of the Chief Judge, the Clerk of Court shall return this case directly to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/04/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01224-RBJ-STV. (athom, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 06/03/2019. (athom, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff why this case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 6/14/2019. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/29/2019. (jgonz, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 VACATED - ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/24/2019. Text Only Entry (dddint1) Modified on 7/3/2019 to vacate pursuant to 21 Order (dkals, ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Wilson. Mark Pauling served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Pulkrabek, Ross)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REASSIGNING JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico, upon his appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings 19-cv-01224-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Ross Whiting Pulkrabek on behalf of Amanda Wilson (Pulkrabek, Ross)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jonathan Pauling, Elyce York, Mark Pauling, Two Mile Ranch, Lardyn Consulting, LLC, Farmers State Bank by Plaintiff Amanda Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Pulkrabek, Ross)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/29/19. (rbjsec. )
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case israndomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01224-RBJ-STV. (sphil, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Farmers State Bank, Lardyn Consulting LLC, Jon Pauling, Mark Pauling, Two Mile Ranch, Elyce York (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6654428)Attorney Ross Whiting Pulkrabek added to party Amanda Wilson(pty:pla), filed by Amanda Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pulkrabek, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Pauling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Mile Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elyce York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pauling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Pauling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lardyn Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers State Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Mile Ranch General Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Wilson
Represented By: Ross Whiting Pulkrabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?