RingCentral, Inc. v. Drabbant et al
Plaintiff: RingCentral, Inc.
Defendant: James Drabbant and RingCentral Professional Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv01250
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER OF JUDGMENT by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/17/2019. (cpear)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Order to Enter Consent Order of Judgment by Plaintiff RingCentral, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order of Judgment)(Hamilton, Hope)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants James Drabbant, RingCentral Professional Services. James Drabbant answer due 6/12/2019; RingCentral Professional Services answer due 6/12/2019. (Cooper, Emily)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Defendants [sic] Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Pleading, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5/23/2019. James Drabbant answer due 5/29/2019; RingCentral Professional Services answer due 5/29/2019. (slibi, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Caroline H. Beavers filed by Plaintiff RingCentral, Inc.. (Cooper, Emily)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Caroline H. Beavers filed by James Drabbant, RingCentral Professional Services. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/22/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Caroline H. Beavers by Defendants James Drabbant, RingCentral Professional Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Pleading)(Beavers, Caroline)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RingCentral, Inc.. RingCentral Professional Services served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Cooper, Emily)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RingCentral, Inc.. James Drabbant served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Cooper, Emily)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 7/24/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge Reid Neureiter on 5/02/2019. (slibi, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/30/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/30/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rroge, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark by Plaintiff RingCentral, Inc. (Cooper, Emily)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Cooper, Emily)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Drabbant, RingCentral Professional Services (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6660540)Attorney Emily Joy Cooper added to party RingCentral, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by RingCentral, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Summons for James Drabbant, #9 Summons for RingCentral Professional Services, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RingCentral, Inc. v. Drabbant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RingCentral, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Joy Cooper
Represented By: Hope Ivy Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Drabbant
Represented By: Caroline Helene Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RingCentral Professional Services
Represented By: Caroline Helene Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?