Wang v. Schoolcraft et al

Plaintiff: Yiyan Wang
Defendant: William B. Schoolcraft, Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, P.C., Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, L.L.C., The and William Schoolcraft
Case Number: 1:2019cv01299
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/28/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, L.L.C., The, William Schoolcraft All parties consent.. (Hensen, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Vacate. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 7/24/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 7/17/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/17/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate July 9, 2019 Scheduling Conference and to Re-Set for July 17, 23, 24, or 25 by Plaintiff Yiyan Wang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Mahoney, Kevin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service on Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming by Plaintiff Yiyan Wang. (Mahoney, Kevin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand Attorney Stephen Jerome Hensen added to party Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, L.L.C., The(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Jerome Hensen added to party William Schoolcraft(pty:dft) by Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, L.L.C., The, William Schoolcraft.(Hensen, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yiyan Wang. Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, L.L.C., The waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Mahoney, Kevin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yiyan Wang. William Schoolcraft waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Mahoney, Kevin)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/9/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 6/25/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/6/2019. (jgonz, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Paul Mahoney & Kevin S. Mahoney .The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6668628)Attorney Paul M. Mahoney added to party Yiyan Wang(pty:pla), filed by Yiyan Wang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mahoney, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Schoolcraft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Schoolcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, L.L.C., The
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Schoolcraft
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yiyan Wang
Represented By: Paul M. Mahoney
Represented By: Kevin Sean Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?