Jones v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Phillip M Jones
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv01305
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 JUDGMENT in favor of Commissioner, Social Security Administration against Phillip M Jones re: #17 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Clerk on 5/30/19. (pglov) (Main Document 18 replaced on 5/30/2019) (pglov, ).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/30/19.(pglov)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 Opening STATEMENT by Plaintiff Phillip M Jones. (athom, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Phillip M Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/13/2019 re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by Commissioner, Social Security Administration. Plaintiff shall file a response on or before 6/7/2019. (athom, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Blower, David)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (athom, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lila Marie Bateman on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security Administration (Bateman, Lila)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Register of Actions by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration (Bateman, Lila)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David I. Blower on behalf of Commissioner of Social SecurityAttorney David I. Blower added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft) (Blower, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 7/5/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision by Commissioner of Social Security against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, filed by Phillip M Jones.(rsams, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry)(rsams, ) Modified on 5/7/2019 to correct docket text(rsams, ).
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Commissioner of Social Security from District Court of Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV000314., filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint)(Bateman, Lila)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lila Marie Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: David I. Blower
Represented By: Lila Marie Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip M Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?