Still v. Zelaya et al

Plaintiff: Linda Still
Defendant: State of Colorado Department of Revenue, Michael Zelaya, USA, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Su Ryden and System Pavers of Colorado, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01317
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting #5 and #6 Stipulations Extending Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, up to and including 7/9/2019, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/19/2019. (ebuch)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Michael Zelaya's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Craig Douglas Flinders added to party Michael Zelaya(pty:dft) by Michael Zelaya.(Flinders, Craig)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint filed by attorney Shawn Carroll Casey.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant State of Colorado Department of Revenue. State of Colorado Department of Revenue answer due 6/18/2019. (Casey, Shawn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 7/9/2019. (diFilipo, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST of Arapahoe County Public Trustee by Defendant Su Ryden. (Kovaci, Monica)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6671897)Attorney Daniel James Vedra added to party Linda Still(pty:pla), filed by Linda Still. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Vedra, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Still v. Zelaya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado Department of Revenue
Represented By: Shawn Carroll Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zelaya
Represented By: Craig Douglas Flinders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Michael David diFilipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Su Ryden
Represented By: Monica N. Kovaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: System Pavers of Colorado, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Still
Represented By: Daniel James Vedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?