Alsip v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judith Alsip
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01350
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Judith Alsip. (Liechty, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #7 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/1/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. All parties consent.. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grace LaVance McGuire on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Grace LaVance McGuire added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (McGuire, Grace)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Joshua B. Kirkpatrick added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) by Charter Communications, Inc..(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/13/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and jury demand against Charter Communications, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6678354)Attorney Robert Mark Liechty added to party Judith Alsip(pty:pla), filed by Judith Alsip. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Liechty, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsip v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Alsip
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Grace LaVance McGuire
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?