USA v. $14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $4,010.00 in United States currency seized from United Fidelity Bank Safe Deposit Box 701, $1,420.00 in United States currency and $14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639
Claimant: Sajida Malik, Waseem Malik and World Food Bazaar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01355
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Claimants Sajida Malik, Waseem Malik, World Food Bazaar, Inc.. (Harmon, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #8 Claim, #9 Claim, #10 Claim filed by attorney Kenneth Mark Harmon. The documents were scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). Also the documents, including doc #7 , have the incorrect case number in the caption. For all future filings, please include the correct case number on your documents, as follows: 19-cv-01355-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM by Claimant Waseem Malik. (Harmon, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM by Claimant Sajida Malik. (Harmon, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Claimant World Food Bazaar, Inc.. (Harmon, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Mark Harmon on behalf of World Food Bazaar, Inc., Sajida Malik, Waseem MalikAttorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party World Food Bazaar, Inc.(pty:clm), Attorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party Sajida Malik(pty:clm), Attorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party Waseem Malik(pty:clm) (Harmon, Kenneth)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (athom, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/14/2019. (athom, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $1,420.00 in United States currency, $14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639, $4,010.00 in United States currency seized from United Fidelity Bank Safe Deposit Box 701 Attorney Laura Beth Hurd added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurd, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,010.00 in United States currency seized from United Fidelity Bank Safe Deposit Box 701
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,420.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Laura Beth Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sajida Malik
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Waseem Malik
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: World Food Bazaar, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?