Navient Solutions, LLC v. Baldon

Petitioner: Navient Solutions, LLC
Respondent: Cynthia Baldon
Case Number: 1:2019cv01391
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 6/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Parties shall file a Stipulation regarding the Petition on or before July 5, 2019. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #8 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/30/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave. Counsel may appear telephonically at the June 18 Status Conference by contacting chambers jointly, on one telephone line at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/30/2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Leave to Attend Status Conference Telephonically #4 Minute Order by Petitioner Navient Solutions, LLC. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Navient Solutions, LLC All parties consent.. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Lohman on behalf of Cynthia BaldonAttorney Jeffrey E. Lohman added to party Cynthia Baldon(pty:res) (Lohman, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Navient Solutions, LLC. Cynthia Baldon waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Navient Corporation for Navient Solutions, LLC. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/17/19. Consent Form due by 6/4/2019. Status Conference set for 6/18/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6686334)Attorney Dennis Norman Lueck, Jr added to party Navient Solutions, LLC(pty:pet), filed by Navient Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A to Petition, #2 Exhibit Exh. B to Petition, #3 Exhibit Exh. C to Petition, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lueck, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navient Solutions, LLC v. Baldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Navient Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. O'Donnell
Represented By: Dennis Norman Lueck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cynthia Baldon
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Lohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?