Lashley v. Lessig

Plaintiff: Melissa Lashley
Defendant: James R Lessig
Case Number: 1:2019cv01400
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Lashley. Regional Care, Inc. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Astuno, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #10 Notice (Other) filed by attorneyJohn J. Astuno, Jr..Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Commencement of Action Under C.R.S. 13-64-402 by Plaintiff Melissa Lashley (Astuno, John)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/26/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/26/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Felix Peters on behalf of James R LessigAttorney John Felix Peters added to party James R Lessig(pty:dft) (Peters, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand Attorney David M. Jones added to party James R Lessig(pty:dft) by James R Lessig.(Jones, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF REVIEW AS TO JAMES R LESSIG DDS by Plaintiff Melissa Lashley. (Astuno, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Lashley. James R Lessig served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Astuno, John)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/16/19. (rbjsec. )
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against James R Lessig (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6688002)Attorney John J. Astuno, Jr added to party Melissa Lashley(pty:pla), filed by Melissa Lashley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Astuno, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lashley v. Lessig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Lashley
Represented By: John J. Astuno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Lessig
Represented By: John Felix Peters
Represented By: David M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?