USA v. 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230
Claimant: Jessica Stringer and Rosttlav Vinarov
Case Number: 1:2019cv01401
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 CLAIM and INTEREST in Property by Claimant Jessica Stringer. (nmarb, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 6/17/19. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss Case without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/17/19.(nmarb, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Case without Prejudice by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, and #10 Claim filed by attorney Stephen L. Laiche. The documents were scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM by Defendant 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230. (Laiche, Stephen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230 All parties consent.. (Laiche, Stephen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen L. Laiche on behalf of 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230Attorney Stephen L. Laiche added to party 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230(pty:dft) (Laiche, Stephen)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby SET for 7/25/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Consent Form is due by 7/18/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/30/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest of Property In Rem issued by Clerk. (nmarb, )
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/16/19. (nmarb, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230 Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 Thor Majestic 28A Motorhome 1FDXE4FS2DDA31230
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jessica Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rosttlav Vinarov
Represented By: Stephen L. Laiche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?