Anstett v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Melanie B Anstett
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01418
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Kafer, Kelly)
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 STRICKEN CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company All parties consent. (Kafer, Kelly) Modified on 7/12/2019 to strike as filed in the improper case (jgonz, ).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Consent Form due by 7/11/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before July 18, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/24/19. (morti, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Kafer, Kelly)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly L. Kafer on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Kelly L. Kafer added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Kafer, Kelly)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tory Drew Riter on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Tory Drew Riter added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Riter, Tory)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1418-STV (angar, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Melanie B AnstettAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Melanie B Anstett(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Patterson, Franklin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT ORDER re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Denver District Court Judge Eric Martin Johnson. (cmadr, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant State Farm's ANSWER and Jury Demand to #6 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(cmadr, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon USAA Casualty Insurance Company on 4/17/2019 (cmadr, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 4/17/2019 (cmadr, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Melanie B Anstett.(cmadr, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #4 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneyKarl A. Chambers and Franklin D. Patterson. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 5/20/2019 (cmadr, ).
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Karl A. Chambers by Franklin D. Patterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Patterson, Franklin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Franklin D. Patterson by Franklin D. Patterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Patterson, Franklin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Patterson, Franklin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019CV31459. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6691368), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q)(Patterson, Franklin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anstett v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Franklin D. Patterson
Represented By: Karl Andrew Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory Drew Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie B Anstett
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?