Cazares-Saenz v. BITCO General Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Martin Cazares-Saenz
Defendant: BITCO General Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01425
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Raymond Andrew Melton on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Raymond Andrew Melton added to party Martin Cazares-Saenz(pty:pla) (Melton, Raymond)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant BITCO General Insurance Corporation. (Chase, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant BITCO General Insurance Corporation All parties consent.. (Chase, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by BITCO General Insurance Corporation.(Chase, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Third Claims for Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant BITCO General Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Chase, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant BITCO General Insurance Corporation. BITCO General Insurance Corporation answer due 6/17/2019. (Chase, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bitco Corporation, Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for BITCO General Insurance Corporation. (Chase, John)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 7/10/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due before 7/17/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/20/2019. (agarc, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon BITCO General Insurance on 4/29/2019. (cmadr, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against BITCO General Insurance Corporation, filed by Martin Cazares-Saenz.(cmadr, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Patrick O'Connor on behalf of BITCO General Insurance CorporationAttorney Sean Patrick O'Connor added to party BITCO General Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (O'Connor, Sean)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant BITCO General Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket)(Chase, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BITCO General Insurance Corporation from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019cv31612. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6694370), filed by BITCO General Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (State Court Civil Cover Sheet), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Colo Sec of State Corp Summary), #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (State Court ROS), #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (State Court Summons), #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Chase, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cazares-Saenz v. BITCO General Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Cazares-Saenz
Represented By: Raymond Andrew Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BITCO General Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?