Gartin et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Timothy Gartin and Cindy Tafoya
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01432
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/12/19. All motions raising issues under Fed. R. Evid. 702, 703, or 704, as codified and construed shall be filed by December 13, 2019. A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set 5/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five Day Jury Trial is set 6/1/2020 through 6/5/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/11/2019. (bwilk, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due 1/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/12/2020. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Frazier, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand Attorney Michael O. Frazier added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Frazier, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/24/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference for 7/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/23/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Timothy Gartin, Cindy TafoyaAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Timothy Gartin (pty:pla), Attorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Cindy Tafoya(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 04/29/2019.(rvill, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Timothy Gartin and Cindy Tafoya.(rvill, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wagner, Rebecca)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2019CV030654. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6695157), filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit A - Summons, #6 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit A - Order Re: Initial Case Management Order/Conference, #8 Exhibit A - Civil Procedure Order, #9 Exhibit A - Return of Service, #10 Exhibit B)(Wagner, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gartin et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Gartin
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Tafoya
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?