USA v. 8 Pieces of Assorted Jewelry et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Assorted Marijuana Grow Equipment, 2018 Yamaha XSR700 Motorcycle, VIN: JYARM27E1JA001741, 8 Pieces of Assorted Jewelry, 2017 Chevrolet Corvette Z06, VIN: 1G1YU2D61H5601152 and $214,396.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Jason Siew and Jessica Stringer
Case Number: 1:2019cv01439
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Claim of Jason Siew by Claimant Jason Siew (Lozow, Gary)
July 7, 2019 Filing 9 Amended CLAIM by Defendant 8 Pieces of Assorted Jewelry. (Cox, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Defendant 8 Pieces of Assorted Jewelry. (Cox, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM by Claimant Jessica Stringer. (jgonz, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (agarc, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/22/2019. (agarc, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $214,396.00 in United States Currency, 2017 Chevrolet Corvette Z06, VIN: 1G1YU2D61H5601152, 2018 Yamaha XSR700 Motorcycle, VIN: JYARM27E1JA001741, 8 Pieces of Assorted Jewelry, Assorted Marijuana Grow Equipment Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 8 Pieces of Assorted Jewelry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Marijuana Grow Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 Yamaha XSR700 Motorcycle, VIN: JYARM27E1JA001741
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8 Pieces of Assorted Jewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2017 Chevrolet Corvette Z06, VIN: 1G1YU2D61H5601152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $214,396.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jason Siew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jessica Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?