RMR Industrials, Inc. v. Garfield County, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: RMR Industrials, Inc.
Defendant: Tom Jankovsky, Garfield County, Colorado, Garfield County, Colorado, Board of Commissioners of, Mike Samson, John Martin and Garfield County Board of County Commissioners, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv01445
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Scheduling Conference which had been set with Magistrate Judge Crews is hereby VACATED and Scheduling Conference re-set for 9/3/2019 01:30 PM (same date and time) but in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Proposed Order due 8/27/2019. The parties are to coordinate so that all parties are on one line at the time the call is placed to the courtroom at (970) 241-8932, Extension 8235. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties at the same time. Parties are urged to be mindful to use capable audio/telephone devices so that audio quality is maintained; if audio quality is insufficient, the matter may need to be rescheduled. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on July 15, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to 22 Minute Order, Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is reassigned to this case and is now as the referral judge. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER re: #21 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. This matter has its factual nexus in Garfield County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-01445-RBJ-GPG. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/9/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, as indicated. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/31/19. (jdyne, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Joint MOTION for Order to Approve Stipulation. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/31/19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #17 Joint MOTION for Order filed by attorney David H. McConaughy.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED - This case is assigned to District Judge R. Brooke Jackson pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(C)(2)(a) because the parties request approval of, by way of Court order, the #17 Stipulation wherein the relief sought has the effect of a preliminary injunction. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01445-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Order to Approve Stipulation by Plaintiff RMR Industrials, Inc.. (McConaughy, David)
May 29, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019. (nmarb, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bailey A. Calhoun on behalf of RMR Industrials, Inc.Attorney Bailey A. Calhoun added to party RMR Industrials, Inc.(pty:pla) (Calhoun, Bailey)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to an unopposed request from the parties, the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 9/3/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties may appear by telephone by initiating a conference call amongst themselves prior to calling 303.335.2124 at the scheduled time. The proposed Scheduling Order shall be due by the close of business on August 27, 2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/28/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 8/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/5/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #8 ) is due 8/5/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/23/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RMR Industrials, Inc.. Mike Samson waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (McConaughy, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RMR Industrials, Inc.. Tom Jankovsky waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (McConaughy, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RMR Industrials, Inc.. John Martin waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (McConaughy, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RMR Industrials, Inc.. Garfield County Board of County Commissioners, The waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (McConaughy, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RMR Industrials, Inc.. Garfield County, Colorado waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (McConaughy, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01445-SKC. (athom, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher David Bryan on behalf of RMR Industrials, Inc. (Bryan, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney David H. McConaughy. The document is incorrectly formatted, all pleadings and documents shall be double spaced. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1 (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiff RMR Industrials, Inc. (McConaughy, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garfield County, Colorado, Garfield County, Colorado, Board of Commissioners of, Tom Jankovsky, John Martin, Mike Samson (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6697950)Attorney David H. McConaughy added to party RMR Industrials, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by RMR Industrials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Garfield County, Colorado, #3 Summons Summons to the Garfield County Board of County Commissioners, #4 Summons Summons to John Martin, #5 Summons Summons to Tom Jankovsky, #6 Summons Summons to Mike Samson)(McConaughy, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RMR Industrials, Inc. v. Garfield County, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMR Industrials, Inc.
Represented By: David H. McConaughy
Represented By: Christopher David Bryan
Represented By: Bailey A. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Jankovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County, Colorado, Board of Commissioners of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Board of County Commissioners, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?