Exterior Experts, Inc. v. Standard Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Exterior Experts, Inc.
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01450
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard D. Daly on behalf of Exterior Experts, Inc.Attorney Richard D. Daly added to party Exterior Experts, Inc.(pty:pla) (Daly, Richard)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint , Separate and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Standard Fire Insurance Company.(Walls, William)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/23/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01450-REB. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Standard Fire Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Walls, William)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5/23/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 7/30/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/13/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Exterior Experts, Inc.Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Exterior Experts, Inc.(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Exterior Experts, Inc.Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Exterior Experts, Inc.(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Standard Fire Insurance Company on 5/2/2019. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Standard Fire Insurance Company, filed by Exterior Experts, Inc..(cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Fire Insurance Company from Jefferson County District, Case Number 2019CV30677. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6700419), filed by Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Return of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-State Ct Docket, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Sec of State, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-Periodic Report, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Walls, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exterior Experts, Inc. v. Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: William Ryan Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exterior Experts, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Daly
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?