Siauw et al v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kuo Siauw and Phoung Siauw
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. and Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01456
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Jury Demand by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company.(Bowers, Robin)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Stipulated Motion to Amend Complaint and to Correct Caption by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/14/2019. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the caption to reflect Defendant's name as Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company answer due 6/21/2019. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER.(tsher, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/14/19 regarding #8 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint to Correct Caption filed by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #10 Order to Nathan T. Mattison, Robert H. Harper, Law Offices of Dianne Sawaya, LLC, 4500 Cherry Creek Drive South, Suite 1030, Denver, CO 80246. Text Only Entry (slibi, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 8/16/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5/24/2019. (slibi, )
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter.IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/23/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint to Correct Caption by Defendant MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Bowers, Robin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robin Lynette Bowers on behalf of MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.Attorney Robin Lynette Bowers added to party MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bowers, Robin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. on 5/02/2019 (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., filed by Phoung Siauw, Kuo Siauw.(cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. from Denver District, Case Number 19cv31661. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6701009), filed by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit E)(Young, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siauw et al v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Jane E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jane E. Young
Represented By: Robin Lynette Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuo Siauw
Represented By: Nathan Todd Mattison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoung Siauw
Represented By: Nathan Todd Mattison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?