Olney v. American National Property and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Dia Olney
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01458
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/16/2019. (jgonz, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Protective Order. The proposed protective order will be entered. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/16/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant American National Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Protective Order)(Singer, Patrick)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order with Draft Stipulated Protective Order by Defendant American National Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Stipulated Protective Order)(Singer, Patrick)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #7 and #10 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/12/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Dia Olney All parties consent.. (Miller, Kristopher)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 Jury Demand and ANSWER to #3 Complaint by American National Property and Casualty Company.(Singer, Patrick)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/22/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 7/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/28/2019. (ksena)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristopher Craig Miller on behalf of Dia OlneyAttorney Kristopher Craig Miller added to party Dia Olney(pty:pla) (Miller, Kristopher)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon American National Property and Casualty Company on 05/17/2019. (rvill, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against American National Property and Casualty Company, filed by Dia Olney.(rvill, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American National Property and Casualty Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 19cv31170. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6701588), filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Summons, #3 Exhibit C Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit E Return of Service)(Singer, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olney v. American National Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Patrick Andrew Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dia Olney
Represented By: Kristopher Craig Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?