Quicken Loans Inc. v. Newland Court Condominium Association et al

Plaintiff: Quicken Loans Inc.
Defendant: Newland Court Condominium Association, Janet S. Commodore, Moeller Graf, P.C. and Erin A. Snow
Case Number: 1:2019cv01485
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quicken Loans Inc.. Quicken Loans Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Hollars, Jacob)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Quicken Loans Inc.. Moeller Graf, P.C. waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Hollars, Jacob)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/16/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/9/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/26/2019. (jgonz, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/26/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/26/2019. ORDERED that the Court's order to show cause #8 is hereby discharged as to plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants. ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendant Snow are DISMISSED without prejudice due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 by Plaintiff Quicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hollars, Jacob)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/12/2019. ORDERED that, on or before 5:00 p.m. on Friday, June 21, 2019, plaintiff shall show cause why this case or, separately, the claims against defendant Snow, should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacob Foster Hollars on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jacob Foster Hollars added to party Quicken Loans Inc.(pty:pla) (Hollars, Jacob)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number COX090417. (rsams, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01485-PAB. (athom, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons issued. (rsams, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400). Attorney David E. Funkhouser, III added to party Quicken Loans Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Funkhouser, David). Modified on 5/31/2019 to correct docket text (rsams, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quicken Loans Inc. v. Newland Court Condominium Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newland Court Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet S. Commodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moeller Graf, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin A. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: David E. Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jacob Foster Hollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?