Friends of Animals v. Perdue et al

Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: United States Forest Service and George Ervin Perdue, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv01510
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (the "Motion"). According to the Motion, the parties have reached a settlement in principle. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 10:30 AM is VACATED. On or before 8/23/2019, the parties shall file dismissal papers or a report regarding the status of settlement. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/25/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants George Ervin Perdue, III, United States Forest Service. (Ross, Katherine)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants United States Forest Service, George Ervin Perdue, III. United States Forest Service answer due 7/24/2019; George Ervin Perdue, III answer due 7/24/2019. (Ross, Katherine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk for George Perdue III. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Jessie K. Liu, #2 Summons for William Barr) (rvill, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Forest Service served on 6/3/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (McVean, Courtney) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct FOIA deadline (jgonz, ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) George Ervin Perdue, III served on 6/3/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (McVean, Courtney) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct FOIA deadline (jgonz, ).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Consent Form due by 7/31/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before August 7, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedulingorder in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/29/19. (morti, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01510-STV. (athom, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sonny Perdue, United States Forest Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6708610)Attorney Courtney Renee McVean added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(McVean, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. Perdue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Ervin Perdue, III
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Courtney Renee McVean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?