Jarboe v. Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Jarboe
Defendant: Stacey L. Harding, Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. and Jeffrey S May
Interested Party: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01529
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to #94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/19. (nmarb, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/19 GRANTING #101 Parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Protective Order (#101-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order. (nmarb, )
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM regarding #101 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/20/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
November 20, 2019 Filing 101 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(McElroy, Jason)
November 8, 2019 Filing 100 RESPONSE to #94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (McElroy, Jason)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply on Motion to Dismiss. Having reviewed the Motion, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that, on or before 12/09/2019, Plaintiff shall file his Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 95), and on or before 1/06/2020, Defendants shall file their reply to Plaintiff's Response. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/04/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
October 30, 2019 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 MOTION to Dismiss the FCA Claims by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/19. (lgale, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 96 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/2019. Discovery due by 5/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020. Status Report due by 6/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss the FCA Claims by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (Delaney, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/16/19 GRANTING #89 Partially Unopposed Motion for Order Establishing a Responsive Deadline. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to October 18, 2019.(nmarb, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 92 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul F. Kirsch on behalf of Thomas R. JarboeAttorney Paul F. Kirsch added to party Thomas R. Jarboe(pty:pla) (Kirsch, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM regarding #89 Defendants' Partially Unopposed Motion for Order Establishing a Responsive Pleading Deadline. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/26/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
September 26, 2019 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Establish a Responsive Pleading Deadline by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (Delaney, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mitchel H. Kider on behalf of Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.Attorney Mitchel H. Kider added to party Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (Kider, Mitchel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Y. Kieval on behalf of Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.Attorney Michael Y. Kieval added to party Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (Kieval, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Wayne McElroy on behalf of Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.Attorney Jason Wayne McElroy added to party Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (McElroy, Jason)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/13/19 GRANTING #83 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/16/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/19 at 9:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 10/23/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM regarding #83 Plaintiff/Realtor Thomas R. Jarboe's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling/Planning Conference. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/12/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
September 12, 2019 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION to Continue SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe, Interested Party USA. (Avanzado, Melvin)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/28/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 9/23/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/30/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1 by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May (Caravajal, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #77 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Corinne Christine Miller is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Company, Inc., Jeffrey S. May, and Stacey L. Harding. The Court notes that Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Company, Inc., Jeffrey S. May, and Stacey L. Harding continue to be represented by Daniel R. Delaney and G. Stephen Caravajal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to delete Ms. Miller's email address from future ECF filings and electronic notifications in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/28/2019. Text Only Entry(cmalc3)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/28/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
June 28, 2019 Filing 78 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe All parties do not consent.. (Avanzado, Melvin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (Miller, Corinne)
June 17, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jasand Patric Mock on behalf of USAAttorney Jasand Patric Mock added to party USA(pty:ip) (Mock, Jasand)
June 4, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Corinne Christine Miller on behalf of All Defendants (Miller, Corinne)
June 4, 2019 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Miller, Corinne)
June 4, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Corinne Christine Miller on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Corinne Christine Miller added to party Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Corinne Christine Miller added to party Stacey L. Harding(pty:dft), Attorney Corinne Christine Miller added to party Jeffrey S May(pty:dft) (Miller, Corinne)
June 4, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Stephen Caravajal, Jr on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Gregory Stephen Caravajal, Jr added to party Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory Stephen Caravajal, Jr added to party Stacey L. Harding(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory Stephen Caravajal, Jr added to party Jeffrey S May(pty:dft) (Caravajal, Gregory)
June 4, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel R. Delaney on behalf of Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S MayAttorney Daniel R. Delaney added to party Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel R. Delaney added to party Stacey L. Harding(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel R. Delaney added to party Jeffrey S May(pty:dft) (Delaney, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melvin N.A. Avanzado on behalf of Thomas R. JarboeAttorney Melvin N.A. Avanzado added to party Thomas R. Jarboe(pty:pla) (Avanzado, Melvin)
May 29, 2019 Filing 69 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 68 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 67 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 66 Case transferred in from the Central District of California; Case Number 2:18-cv-03298. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE [filed 4/29/2019; Docket No. #49 ]; ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS [filed 4/29/2019; Docket No. #48 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to re-filing before the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Case transferred electronically. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 64 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Miller, Corinne) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 63 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado #49 filed by Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Miller, Corinne) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 62 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #48 filed by Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Miller, Corinne) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 61 STATEMENT of DECISION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado #49 [PROPOSED] filed by Plaintiffs Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 60 STATEMENT of DECISION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #48 [PROPOSED] filed by Plaintiffs Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado #49 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Miller, Corinne) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #48 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Miller, Corinne) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 57 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado #49 filed by Plaintiffs Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 56 DECLARATION of MELVIN N.A. AVANZADO IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado #49 filed by Plaintiffs Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 55 DECLARATION of THOMAS R. JARBOE IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado #49 filed by Plaintiffs Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 54 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado #49 filed by Plaintiffs Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 53 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #48 filed by Plaintiffs Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 52 STATEMENT of Interest re Defendants' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #48 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kawakami, Kent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION RE: CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 3, 2019 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS TO JUNE 17, 2019 #50 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 50 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from June 3, 2019 to June 17, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado #49 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #48 filed by defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Corinne) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Colorado filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of John Carson) (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for June 17, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 3, 2019. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kent A Kawakami counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Kent A. Kawakami as counsel of record for United States for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States. (Attorney Kent A Kawakami added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Kawakami, Kent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 45 JOINT REPORT of CONFERENCES OF COUNSEL filed by Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Delaney, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 44 JOINT REPORT of CONFERENCES OF COUNSEL filed by Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Delaney, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 43 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by PLAINTIFF/RELATOR United States of America, Thomas R. Jarboe(Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed 3/21/2019; Docket No. #39 ) by Judge John F. Walter. In light of Defendants' Non-Opposition, Plaintiff and Relator Thomas R. Jarboe's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff and Relator Thomas R. Jarboe shall file his First Amended Complaint on or before April 17, 2019. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNOPPOSED) #39 filed by Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Miller, Corinne) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNOPPOSED) #39 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Miller, Corinne) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNOPPOSED) filed by PLAINTIFF/RELATOR Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline Comparison of Changes, #3 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend) (Attorney Melvin N A Avanzado added to party United States of America(pty:pla)) (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 38 JOINT REPORT of CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL filed by Plaintiffs Thomas R. Jarboe, United States of America. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Delaney filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. (Delaney, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 36 Text Entry Order: Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed on February 8, 2019 (Docket No. #35 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Local Rule 7-3 which requires the conference of counsel to take place at least seven days prior to the filing of the Motion and paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Standing Order which requires the Joint Statement to be filed 3 days after the Local Rule 7-3 conference. If Defendants wish to re-file the Motion, counsel shall meet and confer in person by February 19, 2019. If the parties cannot resolve the issues raised in the Motion, within 3 days of the meet and confer, each party shall file a declaration setting forth the issues resolved at the conference and those issues that were not resolved with a detailed explanation of why those issues could not be resolved. If a Motion remains necessary, it shall not be filed until 2 days after each party files the declaration required by this Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 35 [STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Mohandesi, Behzad) Modified on 2/11/2019 (sr). [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 34 TEXT ENTRY ORDER STRIKING MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 . Hearing date violates this Court's Standing Order. Refer to paragraph 5(a).THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) #19 by Judge John F. Walter. This Court ENTERS an extension of not more than thirty days pursuant to L.R. 8.3, through and including February 8, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Mr. Jarboe's Complaint. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 32 [stricken] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Mohandesi, Behzad) Modified on 2/8/2019 (sr). [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Corinne C. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Jeffrey S. May and Stacey L. Harding, designating Behzad B. Mohandesi as local counsel #27 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Carol A. Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Jeffrey S. May and Stacey L. Harding, designating Behzad B. Mohandesi as local counsel #26 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Delaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Jeffrey S. May and Stacey L. Harding, designating Behzad B. Mohandesi as local counsel #25 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION and Corrected Application of Non-Resident Attorney #21 #22 #23 #25 #26 #27 The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Application on Non-Resident attorney has been updated. See court's website for new form. Missing good standing certificate for attorney Miller. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 27 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Corinne C. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 1/16/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23054295) filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement) (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 26 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carol A. Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 1/16/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23054184) filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement) (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 25 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Delaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 1/16/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23053864) filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement) (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Corinne C. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23054295) #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carol A. Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23054184) #22 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Delaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23053864) #21 (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Corinne C. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23054295) filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement) (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carol A. Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23054184) filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement) (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Delaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23053864) filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement) (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May, (Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeffrey S. May answer now due 2/8/2019; Stacey L. Harding answer now due 2/8/2019; Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. answer now due 2/8/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendants Jeffrey S. May; Stacey L. Harding; Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Behzad Ben Mohandesi added to party Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Behzad Ben Mohandesi added to party Stacey L. Harding(pty:dft), Attorney Behzad Ben Mohandesi added to party Jeffrey S. May(pty:dft))(Mohandesi, Behzad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, Thomas R. Jarboe, upon Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, by Albert Delmonte, Intake Specialist (Agent for Service of Process) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Avanzado, Melvin) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Jeffrey S. May. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Stacey L. Harding. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 UNSEALED ORDER RE ELECTION BY THE UNITED STATES TO DECLINE INTERVENTION AND PARTIAL UNSEALING OF CASE. (iv) Modified on 12/20/2018 (iv). [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 UNSEALED NOTICE OF ELECTION BY THE UNITED STATES TO DECLINE INTERVENTION AND STIPULATION RE PARTIAL UNSEALING OF CASE. (iv) Modified on 12/20/2018 Per Order #11 (iv). [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER EXTENDING SEAL AND GOVERNMENT'S ELECTION PERIOD. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT- MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND GOVERNMENT'S ELECTION PERIOD; DECLARATION OF DONALD W. YOO IN SUPPORT THEREOF. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT- STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND GOVERNMENT'S ELECTION PERIOD. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H. Wu, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-2305 GW (AGRx) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May.Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarboe v. Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USA
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Represented By: Jasand Patric Mock
Represented By: Melvin N.A. Avanzado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey L. Harding
Represented By: Daniel R. Delaney
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Caravajal, Jr.
Represented By: Corinne Christine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R. Delaney
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Caravajal, Jr.
Represented By: Corinne Christine Miller
Represented By: Jason Wayne McElroy
Represented By: Michael Y. Kieval
Represented By: Mitchel H. Kider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S May
Represented By: Daniel R. Delaney
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Caravajal, Jr.
Represented By: Corinne Christine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Jarboe
Represented By: Melvin N.A. Avanzado
Represented By: Paul F. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?