MCI Communications Services, Inc. et al v. B&F Company Inc.
Plaintiff: MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp. and MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Defendant: B&F Company Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01546
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jennings, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Park Jennings on behalf of B&F Company Inc.Attorney John Park Jennings added to party B&F Company Inc.(pty:dft) (Jennings, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Jury Demand by B&F Company Inc..(Chaney, Lelia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lelia Kathleen Chaney on behalf of B&F Company Inc.Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party B&F Company Inc.(pty:dft) (Chaney, Lelia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Jorgenson on behalf of MCI Communications Services, Inc., MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.Attorney Anthony Joseph Jorgenson added to party MCI Communications Services, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Joseph Jorgenson added to party MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.(pty:pla) (Jorgenson, Anthony)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCI Communications Services, Inc., MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.. B&F Company Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Jorgenson, Anthony)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before August 5, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/31/19. (morti, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/31/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Job Seese on behalf of MCI Communications Services, Inc., MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.Attorney Eric Job Seese added to party MCI Communications Services, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Job Seese added to party MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.(pty:pla) (Seese, Eric)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Proszek, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Proszek, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James John Proszek on behalf of MCI Communications Services, Inc., MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp. (Proszek, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&F Company Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6714485)Attorney James John Proszek added to party MCI Communications Services, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney James John Proszek added to party MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.(pty:pla), filed by MCI Communications Services, Inc., MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Proszek, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCI Communications Services, Inc. et al v. B&F Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.
Represented By: Eric Job Seese
Represented By: James John Proszek
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Job Seese
Represented By: James John Proszek
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&F Company Inc.
Represented By: John Park Jennings
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?