In re: Rent-Rite Super Kegs West Ltd.

Plaintiff: Rent-Rite Super Kegs West Ltd.
Defendant: World Business Lenders, LLC
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 1:2019cv01552
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 1. Appellant Brief due by 8/1/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/31/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Volume I) (athom, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Establishing Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Requirement re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Rent-Rite Super Kegs West Ltd. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/31/2019. (athom, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 05/30/2019 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Transmittal of Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8003(d)re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (rvill, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Plaintiff Rent-Rite Super Kegs West Ltd. in re: Judgment in favor of Defendant World Business Lenders, LLC and against Plaintiff [Doc. # 50]; Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying All claims [Doc. #s 48 and 49] of May 20, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying All Claims Doc. 48, #2 Corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying All Claims Doc. 49, #3 Corrected Judgment, #4 Docket Sheet)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Rent-Rite Super Kegs West Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Business Lenders, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Jeffrey Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rent-Rite Super Kegs West Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Represented By: Jennifer E. Schlatter
Represented By: Mark Allan Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?