Toensmeier v. Aureus Medical Group

Plaintiff: ARTHUR M TOENSMEIER and Arthur M. Toensmeier
Defendant: AUREUS MEDICAL GROUP D/B/A AUREUS RADIOLOGY LLC and Aureus Medical Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv01555
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 KLM CIVIL MOTIONS PRACTICE STANDARDS by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/24/19. (lgale, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #9 and #15 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/24/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Arthur M. Toensmeier. (Koupal, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Arthur M. Toensmeier All parties consent.. (Koupal, Christopher)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Plaintiff Arthur M. Toensmeier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Centura Health - Parker Imaging Center/Parker Adventist Hospital)(Koupal, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/10/19, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 7/30/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Filing of the Election ConcerningConsent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction is mandatory, indicating either the unanimous consent of the parties or that at least one party has declined to consent, no later than seven days before the scheduling conference, if any; or 45 days after the filing of the first response, other than an answer, to the operative complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Aureus Radiology, LLC's ANSWER to #7 Complaint and Jury Demand by Aureus Medical Group.(Homiak, Kevin)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin D Homiak on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kevin D Homiak added to party Aureus Medical Group(pty:dft) (Homiak, Kevin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Paul Koupal on behalf of Arthur M. ToensmeierAttorney Christopher Paul Koupal added to party Arthur M. Toensmeier(pty:pla) (Koupal, Christopher)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Aureus Medical Group, filed by Arthur M. Toensmeier.(rvill, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Aureus Medical Group on 05/09/2019. (rvill, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, (Civil Cover Sheet) by Defendant AUREUS MEDICAL GROUP D/B/A AUREUS RADIOLOGY LLC. (Rosenthal, Kara)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by attorney Kara Jean Rosenthal. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent C&A INDUSTRIES, INC. for AUREUS MEDICAL GROUP D/B/A AUREUS RADIOLOGY LLC. (Rosenthal, Kara)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AUREUS MEDICAL GROUP D/B/A AUREUS RADIOLOGY LLC from Douglas County District Court, Colorado, Case Number 2019cv03093. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6715818), filed by AUREUS MEDICAL GROUP D/B/A AUREUS RADIOLOGY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rosenthal, Kara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toensmeier v. Aureus Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUREUS MEDICAL GROUP D/B/A AUREUS RADIOLOGY LLC
Represented By: Kara Jean Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aureus Medical Group
Represented By: Kara Jean Rosenthal
Represented By: Kevin D Homiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR M TOENSMEIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur M. Toensmeier
Represented By: Christopher Paul Koupal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?