Two Rivers Water & Farming Company v. America 2030 Capital Limited et al
Plaintiff: Two Rivers Water & Farming Company
Defendant: America 2030 Capital Limited, Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. and Bentley Rothschild Capital Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv01640
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Two Rivers Water & Farming Company by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc..(Marsh, Douglas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc..(Marsh, Douglas)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/19/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/12/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/3/2019. (jgonz, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in so far as it seeks injunctive relief regarding activity related to the Restricted Shares for the reasons the Court read into the record at the hearing. See (Doc. # 19 ). Accordingly, the Court ORDERS as follows: Defendants America 2030 Capital Limited, Bentley Rothschild Capital Limited, and Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. are hereby enjoinedthrough trial in this matter from engaging in any activity related to: 1. the sale or transfer of any of the Restricted Shares (i.e., 6,800,000 shares by Plaintiff supposedly in exchange for a loan from America 2030 Capital Limited and/or Bentley Rothschild Capital Limited); and 2. removing the restrictive legends on the Restricted Shares, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/2/2019. (evana, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Olson, Leif) (Modified on 6/24/2019 edited to reflect that this is a proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction)(evana, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Christine M. Arguello: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/19/2019. ORDERED: GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The Temporary Restraining Order remains in place. Written Order to follow. (Total time: 24 Minutes, Hearing time: 3:05 p.m. -- 3:29 p.m.)APPEARANCES: Leif Olson on behalf of the Plaintiff; Dougls Marsh on behalf of Defendant Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. ALSO PRESENT: Wayne Harding, Client Representative for TwoRivers Water & Farming Co. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (swest) Text Only Entry
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas Nelson Marsh on behalf of Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.Attorney Douglas Nelson Marsh added to party Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (Marsh, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service of Order (ECF No. 15) to Defs by Plaintiff Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Olson, Leif)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 Utility Confirming Setting Hearing: Pursuant to the #15 Order, that a Hearing is set on Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction Wednesday 6/19/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. Text Only Entry (evana, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Plaintiff's Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #14 ) is GRANTED; Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. (along with its officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and any other person in active concert with any of them) is TEMPORARILY RESTRAINED from removing the restrictive legend on the Restricted Shares (i.e., 6,800,000 shares provided by Plaintiff supposedly in exchange for a loan from America 2030 Capital Limited and/or Bentley Rothschild Capital Limited); Plaintiff, in turn, must refuse any tender of loan proceeds from America 2030 Capital Limited and/or Bentley Rothschild Capital Limited; This order shall expire on Wednesday, June 19, 2019, with a hearing on Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction to be heard on that day at 3:00 PM (MDT); Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to transmit a copy of this order to Defendants by any means (including multiple means, if appropriate) reasonably calculated to reach them promptly, and Plaintiffs must then promptly file a certificate of service explaining how they transmitted this order and whether they have reason to believe that it was received by Defendants. Defendants are required to submit a Response to Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction no later than June 17, 2019 at 12:00 PM (MDT), by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/13/2019.(evana, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Hilbert, Otto)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #11 First MOTION to Supplement Verified motion for TRO filed by attorneyLeif H. Olson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. The address on the docket is not the same as the address on the document filed) (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Before the Court is the Court's June 7, 2019 Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") #9 . The TRO stated that it expires today at 5:00 PM (MDT). To extend the TRO to a full 14 days, the TRO further required Plaintiff to "file an adequate supplemental motion, meeting all the requirements of federal law, sufficiently before 5:00 PM [today], to permit the Court to rule on it." Plaintiff filed a supplemental motion at 4:56 PM, which was not enough time for the Court to address it, and the TRO has therefore EXPIRED by its own terms. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/11/2019, on behalf of Judge Christine M. Arguello. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Supplement Verified motion for TRO by Plaintiff Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Olson, Leif)
June 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/8/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Expedite and granting temporary restraining order per #2 Motion for TRO, by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/07/2019, on behalf of Judge Christine M. Arguello. (wjmlc1)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Plaintiff Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Hilbert, Otto)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01640-CMA. (athom, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:L eif Henry Olson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 6/10/2019 (cmadr, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Otto K. Hilbert, II & Leif Henry Olson. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 6/10/2019 (cmadr, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Plaintiff Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hilbert, Otto)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against America 2030 Capital Limited, Bentley Rothschild Capital Limited, Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6729497)Attorney Otto K. Hilbert, II added to party Two Rivers Water & Farming Company(pty:pla), filed by Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons America 2030 Capital Limited, #9 Summons Bentley Rothschild Capital Limited, #10 Summons Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.)(Hilbert, Otto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Two Rivers Water & Farming Company v. America 2030 Capital Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Two Rivers Water & Farming Company
Represented By: Otto K. Hilbert, II
Represented By: Leif Henry Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America 2030 Capital Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Nelson Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentley Rothschild Capital Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?