Walters v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Douglas Walters
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01644
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
2 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/26/19. (babia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/26/2019. Discovery due by 2/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2020. Status Conference set for 3/26/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: B. Abiakam. (babia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Bell, Devon)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on July 16, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01644-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Wagner, Rebecca)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company.(Bell, Devon)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Devon D. A. Bell on behalf of Allstate Insurance CompanyAttorney Devon D. A. Bell added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Bell, Devon)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Consent Form due by 7/12/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before July 19, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedulingorder in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/11/19. (morti, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1644-SKC (angar, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Allstate Insurance Company on 5/17/2019 (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Allstate Insurance Company, filed by Douglas Walters.(rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company for Allstate Insurance Company. (Wagner, Rebecca)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2019CV30740. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6730320), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C)(Wagner, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Represented By: Devon D. A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Walters
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?