Critical Project Services, LLC v. Dunn et al

Plaintiff: Critical Project Services, LLC
Defendant: Casey Dunn and Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01650
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Critical Project Services, LLC. Casey Dunn waiver sent on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Sears, Natalie)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER : A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/12/2019 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties should contact 303.335.2600 on one joint telephone line at the designated time and should be prepared to discuss the pending Motion to Withdraw #24 . By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8.2.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/1/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC. (Baker, Mary)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond and #21 Joint Motion to Continue. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 8/15/2019. Alternatively, the deadline to submit dismissal papers is set to 8/15/2019. Scheduling Conference set 8/19/2019 is RESET for 9/16/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/9/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7.24.2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, #18 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint filed by Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC, #21 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/24/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendant Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC. (Baker, Mary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, #18 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint by Defendant Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC. (Baker, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #17 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Mary Mikell Baker. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC. Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC answer due 7/24/2019. (Baker, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Mikell Baker on behalf of Worldwide Mission Critical, LLCAttorney Mary Mikell Baker added to party Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC(pty:dft) (Baker, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant Dunn on or before August 9, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7.8.2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Casey Dunn filed by Critical Project Services, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/3/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Casey Dunn by Plaintiff Critical Project Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Extension)(Sears, Natalie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Sears, Natalie)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/14/2019. A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/19/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bwilk, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS re-issued by Clerk 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) #10 summons missing Court seal. (angar, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 DISREGARD - Court Seal missing SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 6/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons) (angar, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 to disregard. Re-issued at #11 (angar, ).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/ 10/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/10/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plaintiff Critical Project Services, LLC. (Sears, Natalie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Defendants re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Critical Project Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Sears, Natalie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorneyNatalie A. Sears and Matt W. Holley.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number: COX090615). Attorney Natalie Anne Sears added to party Critical Project Services, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Critical Project Services, LLC.(Sears, Natalie) Modified on 6/10/2019 (rroge, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Critical Project Services, LLC v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Mission Critical, LLC
Represented By: Mary Mikell Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Critical Project Services, LLC
Represented By: Natalie Anne Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?