Zavanna, LLC v. Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.
Plaintiff: Zavanna, LLC
Defendant: Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01658
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 35 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Zavanna, LLC. (Breslau, Brad)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/23/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #32 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01658-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 32 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Zavanna, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Breslau, Brad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint Attorney Christine Kirchner added to party Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.(pty:dft) by Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P..(Kirchner, Christine)
June 20, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Defendant Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. (Navetta, Kevin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Defendant Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. (Kirchner, Christine)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/1/2019. Consent Form due by 8/1/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/10/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brad W. Breslau on behalf of Zavanna, LLCAttorney Brad W. Breslau added to party Zavanna, LLC(pty:pla) (Breslau, Brad)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from the District of North Dakota; Case Number 1:19-cv-00056. File, transfer order and docket sheet received .
June 7, 2019 Case transferred to District of Colorado. (am) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #20 Motion to Transfer Civil Action and finding as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (RLB) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.. (Kirchner, Christine) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION Transfer Civil Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. 1404(a) (Unopposed) by Zavanna, LLC. (Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 21, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #17 Affidavit, #18 Affidavit, and #19 Affidavit. Clerk's office added descriptions to exhibits pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policy, Section XIII(A). (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration of Bastiaan Cornelissen, Ph.D., P.E. (Exhibit 3 to doc. 16) re #16 Response to Motion by Zavanna, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3A - Resume of Bastiaan Cornelissen, #2 Exhibit 3B - Photo of valve, #3 Exhibit 3C - Warren valve documents, #4 Exhibit 3D - Failure analysis report)(Breslau, Brad) Modified on 5/21/2019 to add descriptions to exhibits. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration of Brad W. Breslau (Exhibit 2 to doc. 16) re #16 Response to Motion by Zavanna, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2A - List and map of DNOW locations in North Dakota)(Breslau, Brad) Modified on 5/21/2019 to add descriptions to exhibits. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration of Cody Duran (Exhibit 1 to doc 16) re #16 Response to Motion by Zavanna, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Invoice, #2 Exhibit 1B - Packing slip, #3 Exhibit 1C - Photo of valve)(Breslau, Brad) Modified on 5/21/2019 to add descriptions to exhibits. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Zavanna, LLC. (Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 20, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #15 RESPONSE to Motion. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Attachments should have been filed as separate events. Counsel was asked to re-file documents. (am) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 *RESTRICTED-ATTACHMENTS SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE EVENTS TO MAIN DOCUMENT* RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Opposition filed by Zavanna, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Breslau, Brad) Modified on 5/20/2019 to restrict access(am). [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Gene A. Mundy)(Kirchner, Christine) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.. (Kirchner, Christine) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christine Kirchner. (am) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number #119000869) by Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.. (Kirchner, Christine) Modified on 4/24/2019 to add receipt number (am). [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Benjamin J. Williams for Zavanna, LLC. Attorney Joseph A. Wetch, Jr. terminated. (BG) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zavanna, LLC. Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019 (Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zavanna, LLC. (Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph Wetch by Zavanna, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. filed by Zavanna, LLC.(Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Zavanna, LLC. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Zavanna, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/11/2019. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000752) filed by Zavanna, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavanna, LLC v. Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.
Represented By: Christine Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zavanna, LLC
Represented By: Brad W. Breslau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?