Schlander v. USA

Plaintiff: Mary Schlander
Defendant: United States of America and USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01660
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Bobet on behalf of USAAttorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party USA(pty:dft) (Bobet, Jane)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Schlander. USA served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Viorst, Anthony)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/10/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 8/6/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/20/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Jury Demand and Certificate of Review against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6731952)Attorney Anthony Jacob Viorst added to party Mary Schlander(pty:pla), filed by Mary Schlander. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Viorst, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlander v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Schlander
Represented By: Anthony Jacob Viorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?