Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The et al v. Pope

Petitioner: Integrated Associates, Inc., The and Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The
Respondent: Ryan B. Pope
Case Number: 1:2019cv01662
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 25 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by attorney Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
August 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Ryan B. Pope. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/3/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
August 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/3/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Petitioners Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The, Integrated Associates, Inc., The, Respondent Ryan B. Pope. (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01662-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/19. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. As of the date of this Minute Order, the parties have not filed the Consent Form indicating whether they consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a district judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioners Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The, Integrated Associates, Inc., The, Respondent Ryan B. Pope All parties do not consent.. (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to submit proposed scheduling order by Respondent Ryan B. Pope. (Lichtenstein, David)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. PLEASE NOTE DATE AND TIME CHANGE ONLY. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict on the Court calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for August 7, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to August 8, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed scheduling order shall be submitted today, August 1, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Lichtenstein on behalf of Ryan B. PopeAttorney David Lichtenstein added to party Ryan B. Pope(pty:res) (Lichtenstein, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew P. Molinaro on behalf of Ryan B. PopeAttorney Matthew P. Molinaro added to party Ryan B. Pope(pty:res) (Molinaro, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Integrated Associates, Inc., The, Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The. Ryan B. Pope waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #2 Brief, Memorandum of Law in Support of First Amended Application to Vacate, or in the Alternative to Modify, Arbitration Award by Petitioners Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The, Integrated Associates, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Moot, #2 Exhibit B - Arbitration Demand, #3 Exhibit C - AAA Management Conference Order, #4 Exhibit D - October 22, 2018 Email, #5 Exhibit E - Claimant's Hearing Exhibit 37, #6 Exhibit F - Respondents' Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #7 Exhibit G - Interim Award, #8 Exhibit H - Respondents' Motion for Clarification and Modification of the Interim Award, #9 Exhibit I - Respondents' Brief in Response to Claimant's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, #10 Exhibit J - Claimant's Request for Clarification of Award)(Gokenbach, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Petition/Application,, First Amended Application to Vacate, or in the Alternative to Modify, Arbitration Award by Petitioners Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The, Integrated Associates, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Award, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Re Motion for Clarification of Award, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Transmitting Order Re Motion for Clarification of Award, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Denying Motion for Remand, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Minute Order Dismissing Action)(Gokenbach, Jennifer)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/19. Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#7-1] is July 24, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01662-KLM. (athom, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
June 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #2 Brief, Memorandum of Law in Support of Petitioners' Application to Vacate, or in the Alternative to Modify, the Arbitration Award by Petitioners Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The, Integrated Associates, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trial Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit Trial Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit Trial Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit Trial Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit Trial Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit Trial Exhibit L)(Gokenbach, Jennifer)
June 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Petition/Application,, Civil Case Cover Sheet by Petitioners Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The, Integrated Associates, Inc., The (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
June 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ryan B. Pope re #1 Petition/Application,, by Petitioners Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The, Integrated Associates, Inc., The. (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
June 8, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF re #1 Petition/Application,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Petitioners' Application to Vacate, or in the Alternative to Modify, the Arbitration Award by Petitioners Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The, Integrated Associates, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Gokenbach, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Vacate, or in the Alternative to Modify, the Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6732014)Attorney Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach added to party Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The(pty:pet), Attorney Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach added to party Integrated Associates, Inc., The(pty:pet), filed by Integrated Associates, Inc., The, Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Clarifying Award, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Denying Motion for Remand)(Gokenbach, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The et al v. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Integrated Associates, Inc., The
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Integrated Associates of Denver, Inc., The
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan B. Pope
Represented By: David Lichtenstein
Represented By: Matthew P. Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?