Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Spot LLC
Plaintiff: Inventergy LBS, LLC
Defendant: Spot LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01670
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Spot LLC's answer is due by 8/19/2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/29/19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Spot LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Leachman, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael K. Leachman on behalf of Spot LLCAttorney Michael K. Leachman added to party Spot LLC(pty:dft) (Leachman, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Spot LLC's answer is due 7/29/2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/8/19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
July 6, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/11/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX090617. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Spot LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, AO 120 Patent Report by Plaintiff Inventergy LBS, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Inventergy LBS, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spot LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Inventergy LBS, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Spot LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventergy LBS, LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spot LLC
Represented By: Michael K. Leachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?