Stevens v. Mulay
Plaintiff: Michelle Stevens
Defendant: David Mulay
Case Number: 1:2019cv01675
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by David Mulay.(Tenner, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Josephine Lowrey on behalf of Michelle StevensAttorney Mary Josephine Lowrey added to party Michelle Stevens(pty:pla) (Lowrey, Mary)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marci Gilligan LaBranche on behalf of David MulayAttorney Marci Gilligan LaBranche added to party David Mulay(pty:dft) (LaBranche, Marci)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to D.C.COLO. LCivR 6.1 by Defendant David Mulay.. (Tenner, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Tenner on behalf of David MulayAttorney David M. Tenner added to party David Mulay(pty:dft) (Tenner, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Stevens. David Mulay served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Lebsack, James)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3-1] is September 24, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/26/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/25/19. Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against David Mulay (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6733933)Attorney James Bennett Lebsack added to party Michelle Stevens(pty:pla), filed by Michelle Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lebsack, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Mulay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mulay
Represented By: Marci Gilligan LaBranche
Represented By: David M. Tenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Stevens
Represented By: James Bennett Lebsack
Represented By: Mary Josephine Lowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?