Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.243.88.124
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.243.88.124
Case Number: 1:2019cv01684
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Before a Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/24/2019.(mdave, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM regarding #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/24/2019. Text Only Entry (wydlc2, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bandlow, Lincoln)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/12/2019. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Marcia S. Krieger. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. Text Only Entry (mehlc2 )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge who is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/11/2019. Text Only Entry (wydlc2, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Action for Damages For Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.243.88.124 (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6734735)Attorney Lincoln Dee Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.243.88.124
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.243.88.124
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?