Storage War Store, LLC et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mike Pentel and Storage War Store, LLC
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01689
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David H. Wollins on behalf of Mike Pentel, Storage War Store, LLCAttorney David H. Wollins added to party Mike Pentel(pty:pla), Attorney David H. Wollins added to party Storage War Store, LLC(pty:pla) (Wollins, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Kroupa, Christine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company (Kroupa, Christine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John M. Palmeri on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance CompanyAttorney John M. Palmeri added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Palmeri, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #8 Order to David H. Wollins, David H. Wollins, P.C., 950 South Cherry Street, Suite 512, Denver, Colorado 80246. Text Only Entry (tsher, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/12/2019. Consent Form due by 8/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Kroupa, Christine)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Scottsdale Insurance Company on 05/21/2019 (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry.. (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Verified COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Scottsdale Insurance Company, filed by Storage War Store, LLC, Mike Pentel.(rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Scottsdale Insurance Company from Adams County District Court, Case Number 2019-CV-30878. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6735247), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Verified Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 State Court Exhibit 1 to Verified Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 State Court Summons and Affidavit of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Kroupa, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storage War Store, LLC et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine Marie Kroupa
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Pentel
Represented By: David H. Wollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Storage War Store, LLC
Represented By: David H. Wollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?