Ritschard v. Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Dale Ritschard
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv01693
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED 502(d) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/8/2019. (cthom, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Amended Damages Calculation by Plaintiff Dale Ritschard (Kloewer, Bradley)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION Stipulated 502(d) Order by Plaintiff Dale Ritschard. (Kloewer, Bradley)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/29/2019. (ebuch)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/29/2019. Status Report due by 2/3/2020. Discovery due by 1/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: Courtroom A-401. (Attachments: #1 Requirements of Practice) (ebuch)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Standard Fire Insurance Company, The. (Koehler, Jonathan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Standard Fire Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Koehler, Jonathan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathanael Thomas Archuleta on behalf of Dale RitschardAttorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Dale Ritschard(pty:pla) (Archuleta, Nathanael)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/25/19. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lgale, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Adam Kloewer on behalf of Dale RitschardAttorney Bradley Adam Kloewer added to party Dale Ritschard(pty:pla) (Kloewer, Bradley)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Complaint , Separate and Affirmative Defenses and Jury demand by Standard Fire Insurance Company, The.(Koehler, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/11/19. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,,, State Court Docket by Defendant Standard Fire Insurance Company, The (Koehler, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Thomas Koehler on behalf of Standard Fire Insurance Company, The (Koehler, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Denver County District Court Judge David Goldberg on 05/30/2019. (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Standard Fire Insurance Company, The, filed by Dale Ritschard.(rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of The Standard Fire Insurance CompanyAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party The Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc. for The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Koehler, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Standard Fire Insurance Company from District Court, Denver County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2019-CV-31807. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6735853), filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Motion for Extension of Time, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #7 Exhibit G - Service of Commissioner of Insurance, #8 Exhibit H - Correspondence from Plaintiff's Counsel, #9 Exhibit I - Certificate of Good Standing, #10 Exhibit J - Notice of Removal to State Court, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Koehler, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritschard v. Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Ritschard
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Represented By: Bradley Adam Kloewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?