Asiamah v. USAA
Plaintiff: Riddick J. Amoako Asiamah
Defendant: USAA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01706
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/8/19. (jdyne, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set August 8, 2019 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/19/19. (rbjsec.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01706-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE re #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA (Moseley, Jeremy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA All parties do not consent.. (Moseley, Jeremy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant USAAs Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) by Defendant USAA. (Hobbs, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant USAA (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet)(Hobbs, Carrie)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court is cognizant that Plaintiff opposes the Motion; however, the Scheduling Conference in this case is not set until August, and therefore, the Court can perceive no prejudice in a brief extension. USAA may have an extension of time, up to and including 7/2/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/17/2019. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant USAA. (Hobbs, Carrie)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Moseley, Jeremy)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINEFOR FILING CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Consent Form due by 8/1/2019. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/1/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/12/19. (amont, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER on Motion to Correct Exhibits. By Ross B. Buchanan, District Court Judge, Denver County on 05/22/2019. (rsams, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER on Motion for Time Extension. By Ross B. Buchanan, District Court Judge, Denver County on 5/22/2019. (rsams, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER to Show Cause. By Ross B.H. Buchanan, District Court Judge, Denver County on 05/01/2019. (rsams, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon USAA on May 21, 2019. (rsams, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against USAA, filed by Riddick J. Amoako Asiamah.(rsams, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA from District Court of Denver County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV000112. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6737443), filed by USAA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USAA CIC Declaration in Support of Removal - Harris, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declarations Page, #3 Exhibit 3 - USAA CIC Declaration in Support of Removal - Fuller, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 State Court - Complaint 02.25.19, #6 State Court - Affidavit of Service 05.23.19, #7 State Court - Summons 02.25.19, #8 State Court - Order to Show Cause 05.01.19, #9 State Court - Order Granting Motion for Time Extension 05.22.19, #10 State Court - Order Granting Motion to Correct Exhibits 05.22.19, #11 State Court - Pltf's Civil Cover Sheet 02.25.19, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asiamah v. USAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riddick J. Amoako Asiamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Represented By: Carrie M. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?