Wallace v. American Express National Bank
Plaintiff: Brian William Wallace
Defendant: American Express Company and American Express National Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv01721
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/23/2019. Attorney Alisa Taormina may appear telephonically for the September 4 Status Conference by calling chambers at (303) 335-2600 at the designated time. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM regarding #28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference filed by American Express National Bank. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/22/2019. Text Only Entry (ebuch)
July 19, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Defendant American Express National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Taormina, Alisa)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/18/2019. Pending before this court is Plaintiff's Motion requesting leave to appear at the September 4, 2019 Status Conference by telephone. Upon review of the Motion, this court DENIES Plaintiff's request and ORDERS that Plaintiff be physically present for the September 4, 2019 Status Conference in courtroom A502 before the undersigned. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Brian William Wallace. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/18/2019. Text Only Entry (ebuch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear at Status Conference Via Telephone and [Proposed] Order by Plaintiff Brian William Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Order, #2 Envelope) (athom, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #23 Minute Order, to Brian William Wallace, 5994 South Holly Street, Suite 244, Denver, CO 80111. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/10/19. Status Conference set for 9/5/19 at 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 9/4/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order is to be sent to the following:Brian William Wallace, 5994 South Holly Street, Suite 244, Denver, CO 80111. (nmarb, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/1/2019. A Status Conference is set for 9/5/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bwilk, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant American Express Company. (Taormina, Alisa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Express Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/28/2019. Text Only Entry (ebuch)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/28/2019. (ebuch)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Brian William Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Brian William Wallace. All parties do not consent. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION of Related Cases by Alisa Marie Taormina on behalf of American Express Company (Taormina, Alisa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01721-LTB-NYW. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit text.(sphil, ).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/19/2019. ORDERED that the clerk's office shall reassign this case by random draw. (sphil, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Express Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Other Affiliate American Express National Bank, Other Affiliate American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. for American Express Company. (Taormina, Alisa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant American Express Company. (Taormina, Alisa)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/18/2019. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to 9 Order Reassigning Case. This case has been reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01721-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(1), the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer as the presiding judge, and to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang as the referral judge. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/17/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 9/5/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/14/2019. (slibi, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/13/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon American Express Company on 05/22/2019. (rsams, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Private Action Claim against American Express Company, filed by Brian William Wallace.(rsams, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Express Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 19CV268. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6739594), filed by American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Backer, Kali)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. American Express National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian William Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Kali R. Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Represented By: Kali R. Backer
Represented By: Brian Charles Frontino
Represented By: Alisa Marie Taormina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?